IL HB1254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0028
2017-08-04HouseEffective Date August 4, 2017
2017-08-04HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551A-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback