IL HB1253 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the members of the State Board of Education.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-054-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-13 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |