IL HB1252 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Employment Security Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Department of Employment Security shall create a COBRA Relief Program under which an individual who is receiving regular or extended unemployment insurance benefits and is eligible for COBRA continuation coverage may apply to the Department for participation in the Program. Provides that, under the program, an individual's costs of COBRA continuation coverage are limited to 25% of the amount of his or her unemployment insurance benefits, the individual certifies to the Department, by the first day of each month, the total cost of COBRA benefits paid by the person in the preceding month, and the Department pays the remainder of individual's costs of COBRA continuation coverage. Sets forth criteria for expiration of an individual's eligibility and provides for the adoption of rules to implement and administer the Program.
Title
EMPLOYMENT SEC-COBRA RELIEF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1005 | 1005-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1005 | 1005-165 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1005 | 43a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1252&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1252.htm |