IL HB1231 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Armed Security Protection Act. Provides that beginning July 1, 2024, banks, pawn shops, grocery stores, and gas stations in municipalities having a population in excess of 2,000,000 inhabitants must employ and have on the premises at least one guard during the hours they conduct business with the public. Provides that the Act is inoperable after June 30, 2027.
Title
BANK GROCERY GAS ARMED GUARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1231&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1231.htm |