IL HB1190 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Underground Natural Gas Storage Safety Act. Provides that the owner or operator of an underground natural gas storage facility shall create procedures for a suspected natural gas leak or suspected unintentional release from an underground natural gas storage facility that is identified by either the Department of Natural Resources or the operator or owner. Requires collecting and testing to be performed by an independent contractor at the expense of the owner or operator. Allows the owner or operator to acknowledge that the leak or unintentional release is from the underground natural gas storage facility and treat it as a verified facility release in substitution of performing collection and testing. Requires the owner or operator to have procedures to be used if the gas is identified or conceded to be a verified facility release. Requires the owner or operator to perform sampling at a frequency as determined by the owner or operator for natural gas in private drinking water wells in the areas determined by the owner or operator impacted by the leak or unintentional release. Requires the owner or operator to maintain routine monitoring of the areas impacted by the leak or unintentional release as determined by the owner's or operator's procedures. Provides that if natural gas is detected at levels posing health or hazard issues, the owner or operator shall offer and maintain gas water separators in affected areas impacting the water supply. Provides that with the property owner's or occupant's consent, the owner or operator shall provide, install, and maintain natural gas detection devices determined to be appropriate by the owner or operator in the affected areas to monitor the presence of natural gas. Requires the owner or operator to maintain routine monitoring of the areas impacted by the leak or unintentional release by method and frequency and create a schedule to be shared with the Department of Natural Resources, the Environmental Protection Agency, and the Department of Public Health. Defines "verified facility release".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATURAL GAS-VERIFIED RELEASES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0120
2023-06-30HouseEffective Date January 1, 2024
2023-06-30HouseGovernor Approved
2023-06-08HouseSent to the Governor
2023-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2023-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2023-05-10HousePassed Both Houses
2023-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2023-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2023-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
2023-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2023-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
2023-04-27SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000
2023-04-18SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2023-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
2023-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2023-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2023-03-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2023-03-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2023-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2023-03-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2023-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2023-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000
2023-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
2023-03-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2023-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
2023-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
2023-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2023-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2023-02-15HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2023-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41516027New CodeSee Bill Text
4151605Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback