IL HB1187 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governmental Account Audit Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning reports to the Comptroller.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 012-007-000
2018-04-24HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-10HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-21HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-03-19HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
503107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback