IL HB1132 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35105-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback