IL HB1126 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning adjustments to base income by the Director of Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-001-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-05-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355404Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback