IL HB1125 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning income allocation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2017
2017-05-22SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-003-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-001-000
2017-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355302Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback