IL HB1123 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill with the following changes. Removes provisions requiring the student outcome data on a school report card to include the percentage of students with disabilities who have fulfilled the minimum State graduation requirements but have not completed their individualized education program and are enrolled and receiving individualized education program services. Provides that for any school report card prepared after July 1, 2025, for all high school graduation completion rates that are reported on the school report card, the State Superintendent of Education shall also report the percentage of students who did not meet the requirements of high school graduation completion for any reason and, of those students, the percentage that are classified as students who fulfill the requirements of the participation in graduation provisions of the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Requires the State Superintendent to ensure that for the 2023-2024 school year there is a specific code for districts to report students who fulfill the requirements of those provisions. Provides that these reporting requirements shall be included on the school report card where high school graduation completion rates are reported, along with a brief explanation. Adds an immediate effective date.
Title
SCH CD-SCHOOL REPORT CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0116 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |