IL HB1115 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Juvenile Justice assuming the duties of the Juvenile Division of the Department of Corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-049-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-004-000
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-19HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2.5-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback