IL HB1115 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that applications for electronic monitoring or home detention may include parole or mandatory supervised release, but only for individuals who: (1) are subject to mandatory electronic monitoring; (2) were convicted for an offense before January 1, 2007 that would have otherwise qualified the accused as a sexual predator under the Sex Offender Registration Act, but only if expressly ordered by the Prisoner Review Board; (3) were convicted for an offense, committed before August 11, 2009, of criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, criminal sexual abuse, aggravated criminal sexual abuse, or ritualized abuse of a child when the victim was under 18 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense and the defendant used force or the threat of force in the commission of the offense, but only if expressly ordered by the Prisoner Review Board; or (4) are ordered to be placed on electronic monitoring as part of a graduated sanctions program when all other less restrictive alternative sanctions have been exhausted. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Criminal Law |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-049-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-004-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |