IL HB1091 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the applicability of the common law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-008-000
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-21HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback