IL HB1083 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, any provision in a collective bargaining agreement that would limit the ability of a public employer to investigate the conduct of an employee of the public employer is declared to be against public policy and unenforceable unless the limitation is otherwise required by State or federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE DISCIPLINARY COMPLAINT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2023-01-04HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531520Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback