IL HB1059 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use of Credit Information in Personal Insurance Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other law, an insurer authorized to do business in the State may not use the credit information of an applicant or a policyholder as a factor to determine insurance rates for any private passenger automobile insurance policy that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Directs the Department of Insurance to adopt rules to enforce and administer this requirement. Makes a conforming change in a provision concerning the Department's enforcement powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-USE OF CREDIT INFO/AUTO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-02HouseTo Insurance Main Subcommittee
2023-02-24HouseTo Insurance Main Subcommittee
2023-02-15HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2022-12-21HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21515721New CodeSee Bill Text
21515745Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback