IL HB1054 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024 that provides coverage for prescription drugs shall require that a covered individual's defined cost sharing for each prescription drug shall be calculated at the point of sale based on a price that is reduced by an amount equal to at least 100% of all rebates received in connection with the dispensation or administration of the prescription drug. Provides that an insurer shall apply any rebate amount in excess of the defined cost sharing amount to the health plan to reduce premiums. Provides that the provisions shall not preclude an insurer from decreasing a covered individual's defined cost sharing by an amount greater than the stated amount at the point of sale. Provides that the Department of Insurance may adopt rules to implement the provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-COST SHARING/DRUG REBATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-08HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
2023-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
2023-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2023-02-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2022-12-21HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.60New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback