IL HB1042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Central Management Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-22HouseArrived in House
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
2018-05-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-001-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-03-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback