IL HB1031 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, to address maternal mental health conditions and reduce the incidence of maternal mortality and morbidity and postpartum depression, pregnant women eligible to receive medical assistance shall receive coverage for prenatal and postnatal support services during pregnancy and during the 5-year period beginning on the last day of the pregnancy. Provides that prenatal and postnatal support services covered under the medical assistance program include, but are not limited to, services provided by doulas, lactation counselors, labor assistants, childbirth educators, community mental health centers or behavioral clinics, social workers, and public health nurses as well as any other evidence-based mental health and social care services that are designed to screen, identify, and manage maternal mental disorders. Permits the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to consult with the Department of Human Services and the Department of Public Health to establish a program of services consistent with the purposes of the amendatory Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to apply for any federal waiver or State Plan amendment required to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act. Requires the Department to adopt rules, upon federal approval, on certification or licensing requirements for providers of prenatal and postnatal support services and rules to provide medical assistance reimbursement for such services.
Title
MEDICAID-MATERNAL MENTAL HLTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1031&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1031.htm |