IL HB1023 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governor's Office of New Americans Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-02-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-02-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-01-26SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-01SenateArrive in Senate
2017-10-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2017-10-26House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-10-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-17HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-10-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback