IL HB1010 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-001-001
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-22HouseArrived in House
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Government Reform; 008-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-04-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-21HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-03-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback