IL HB0930 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that notwithstanding any provision of the Code to the contrary, forensic testing that would result in the complete consumption of an evidentiary sample shall be permitted if the forensic testing utilizes methods sufficiently established in the particular field that have gained general acceptance and the forensic testing was not conducted in bad faith. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for a law enforcement agency or an agent acting on behalf of the law enforcement agency to intentionally fail to comply with the provision. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony.
Title
CRIM PRO-EVIDENTIARY SAMPLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-19 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 33-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 116-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=930&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0930.htm |