IL HB0893 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for employers who pay costs in connection with a qualified wellness program. Provides that the amount of the credit is 50% of those costs per year up to $200 per employee for the first 200 employees and $100 per employee for the remaining employees. Sets forth the requirements for qualified wellness programs. Provides that the credit may not be carried forward or back and may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-HEALTHY WORKFORCE CR
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Jack McGuire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=893&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0893.htm |