IL HB0878 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no legislator while serving as a member of the General Assembly shall concurrently serve as the chairperson for a statewide political party.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA MEMBER-STATE PARTY CHAIR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-02-14HouseTo Constitutional Law Subcommittee
2019-02-14HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-14HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-003-000
2019-02-08HouseTo Constitutional Law Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54202-105New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback