IL HB0873 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Metro East Development Act. States legislative findings for the need to create a Metro East Development Authority, including the need to develop and revitalize depressed areas of the Metro East. Defines "Metro East" as Madison, Monroe, Randolph, and St. Clair counties. Provides for the creation of the Authority, including the appointment of 12 members by the chairperson of each Metro East county; by the directors of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Illinois Housing Development Authority, and the Illinois Development Finance Authority; and by the Governor. Allows the Authority to hire an executive director. Lists the rights, powers, and duties of the Authority, including the power to borrow money and to issue bonds. Provides that the Authority shall perform an initial study and survey to determine what areas will be considered a depressed areas that contain a commercially, industrially, residentially, recreationally, educationally, or other blighted area. Provides for requirements related to meetings, public hearings, and administrative and judicial review of Authority projects. Provides for limitations on the Authority's powers. Describes procedures for procurement of debt and bonds, execution of deeds, demolition and removal of buildings, purchase of property, contracts, and costs of projects. Gives the Authority the power to investigate the conditions of any project in which it has an interest. Effective immediately

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

METRO EAST DEVELOPMENT ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback