IL HB0872 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. With respect to the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that, beginning in assessment year 2019, the taxpayer's household income shall be reduced by any amounts paid as Medicare premiums. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX-SR FREEZE-MEDICARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-14HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback