IL HB0857 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Beginning with the 2021-2022 school year, requires each school board to post on its district's Internet website, if one is maintained, or in the district's main administrative office, if the district does not maintain an Internet website, all curricula to be taught in each school during the next school year for parents and guardians of students to review. Provides that, as part of the posting, the school board shall identify how each school's curricula align with the Illinois Learning Standards. Provides that if the curricula are updated at any time during the school year, the posted curricula shall be revised to reflect the updated curricula. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
SCH CD-CURRICULA ON WEBSITE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=857&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0857.htm |