IL HB0855 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Legislative Accessibility Act. Provides that the General Assembly shall make all efforts to increase the accessibility of the General Assembly for people with disabilities. Provides that the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President of the Senate shall each appoint an accessibility coordinator who, in consultation with the Architect of the Capitol, shall be responsible for addressing accessibility needs for his or her corresponding house. Provides that the Illinois General Assembly website shall include either an email address, webform, or other similar mechanism to request reasonable accommodations to meet the accessibility needs of people with disabilities attending legislative events. Establishes the General Assembly Accessibility Task Force. Provides for the membership and meetings of the Task Force. Provides that members and ex officio members of the Task Force shall serve without compensation. Provides administrative support for the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall examine issues concerning accessibility of persons with a disability. Requires the Task Force to make recommendations to the General Assembly concerning General Assembly accessibility no later than December 31, 2021. Repeals specified provisions January 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
LEGISLATIVE ACCESSIBILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |