IL HB0844 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that Independent Service Coordination agencies shall be exempt from the provisions of the Act with respect to the grant application and notice of opportunity process. Provides that any award granted under the Act by the Division of Developmental Disabilities of the Department of Human Services to an Independent Service Coordination agency prior to the effective date of this amendatory Act is void. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall be construed to prevent the Division from providing grants to Independent Service Coordination agencies. Defines "Independent Service Coordination agency". Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |