IL HB0842 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Guardianship Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Deletes language providing that if the respondent is unable to pay the fee of the guardian ad litem or appointed counsel, or both, the court may enter an order for the petitioner to pay all such fees or such amounts as the respondent or the respondent's estate may be unable to pay. Provides instead that the allocation of guardian ad litem fees and costs is within the discretion of the court. Provides that no legal fees, appointed counsel fees, guardian ad litem fees, or costs shall be assessed against the Office of the State Guardian, the public guardian, an adult protective services agency, the Department of Children and Family Services, or the agency designated by the Governor under the Protection and Advocacy for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act.
Title
PROBATE-GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES
Sponsors
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Sen. John Connor [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0191 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11a-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |