IL HB0839 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits use of a scanning device or reencoder to defraud when the person knowingly possesses, sells, or delivers a scanning device or reencoder, other than for the purpose of processing information to facilitate a lawful financial transaction. Increases the penalties for use of a scanning device or reencoder to defraud from a Class 4 felony for a first offense to a Class 3 felony and for a second or subsequent offense from a Class 3 felony to a Class 2 felony. Provides that the knowing sale or delivery of the device or reencoder is a Class 2 felony for a first offense and a Class 1 felony for a second or subsequent offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-SCANNING DEVICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-19HouseTo Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720516-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback