IL HB0838 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Keep Illinois Business Act. Provides that any recipient business that chooses to move all or part of its business operations and the jobs created by its business out-of-State shall be deemed to no longer qualify for State economic development assistance, and shall be required to pay to the relevant State granting agency the full amount of any economic development assistance it received. Provides for procedures for the recovery of economic development assistance, including required notice to the recipient business and an opportunity for a hearing. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

KEEP ILLINOIS BUSINESS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-14HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback