IL HB0830 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Agricultural Areas Conservation and Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
AGRICULTURE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-27 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000 |
2011-04-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |