IL HB0823 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to ensure that those who draw blood from children and adults with intellectual and developmental disabilities are trained, at least once every 3 years, in the most current method of drawing blood from children and adults with developmental and intellectual disabilities. Provides that the training shall focus on drawing blood in a safe manner that is as comfortable as possible. Requires the Department to ensure that those facilities and providers review their training program at least once within each 3-year period to ensure that the training includes the most current methods available of drawing blood from children and adults with intellectual and developmental disabilities that is safe and comfortable for them and their families. Requires the Department to ensure that by July 1, 2020 all medical facilities are equipped to draw blood from children and adults with intellectual and developmental disabilities using finger-prick equipment, hemoglobin testing equipment, and all other related equipment that can be adapted to serve patients with intellectual and developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-PHLEBOTOMY-TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-13HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-01-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-218New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback