IL HB0822 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Care of Students with Diabetes Act. Provides that a school may maintain a supply of glucagon medication in any secure location that is accessible before, during, or after school where a student is most at risk, including, but not limited to, a classroom or the nurse's office; defines "glucagon medication" and "undesignated glucagon medication". Provides that a physician, a physician assistant who has prescriptive authority, or an advanced practice registered nurse who has prescriptive authority may prescribe undesignated glucagon medication in the name of the school to be maintained for use when necessary. Allows a delegated care aide to carry undesignated glucagon medication. Provides that within 24 hours after the administration of undesignated glucagon medication, a school must notify the school nurse and the student's parent or guardian or emergency contact, if known, and health care provider of its use. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNDESIGNATED GLUCAGON-SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0428
2019-08-19HouseEffective Date August 19, 2019
2019-08-19HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Education; 013-000-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10514510Amended CodeCitation Text
10514520Amended CodeCitation Text
10514525Amended CodeCitation Text
10514527New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback