IL HB0818 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that a member of the General Assembly who has held office any part of a month, but not for the entire month, is entitled to compensation only for those days during that month that he or she held office (currently, entitled to compensation for the entire month). Effective immediately.
Title
GA MEMBER MONTHLY PAY
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] |
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-12-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-11-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=818&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0818.htm |