IL HB0816 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides for registration under the Act of a person convicted of a battery when the court: (1) finds that the battery was sexually motivated as defined in the Sex Offender Management Board Act; and (2) in its discretion requires the person to register under the Act.
Title
SEX OFFENDER REG-BATTERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2018-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-03-21 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2017-12-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-16 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=816&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0816.htm |