IL HB0815 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that certain police officers and firefighters who participate in IMRF may be granted Sheriff's Law Enforcement Employee (SLEP) status with the approval of the employing municipality. The approval resolution must specify that SLEP status shall be applied to employment occurring on or after the adoption of the resolution. Provides that the resolution is irrevocable, but shall automatically terminate upon the establishment of an Article 3 or 4 fund by the municipality. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-IMRF-FIREFIGHTER SLEP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-024-000
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-003-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4057-109.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback