IL HB0814 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that if the estate of a ward consists only of money, the court may order, among other dispositions, the money deposited in a qualified tuition program.
Title
PROBATE-WARD MONEY-529 PLAN
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0189 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 24-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |