IL HB0814 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that an elected or appointed member of a public body of a municipality may satisfy the training requirements under the Open Meetings Act by participating in a course of training sponsored or conducted by an organization that represents municipalities as designated under a specified Section of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides content requirements for the training. Provides that if an organization representing municipalities provides training, it must provide a certificate of course completion to each elected or appointed member of a public body who successfully completes that course of training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPEN MEETINGS-TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Local Government; 007-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51201.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback