IL HB0808 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that no member maintaining a permanent or primary residence in Sangamon County shall receive allowance for travel to a convened session of the General Assembly or for food and lodging while in attendance at sessions of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA COMPENSATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback