IL HB0796 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill, but provides for the University of Illinois to admit community college transfer students (rather than first-time freshman students) under the pilot program. Specifies that the University of Illinois provides multiple pathways to transfer and shall guarantee admission to all applicants who (i) have enrolled only at an Illinois community college after graduating from an Illinois high school; (ii) have earned a minimum of 36 graded, transferable semester hours at the time of application to the University; (iii) have attained a minimum grade point average of 3.0 in all transferable coursework completed at the time of application to the University; and (iv) have satisfied the university's English language proficiency requirement.
Title
UNIVERSITY UNIFORM ADMISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0187 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 118 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 118 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 118 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 118 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 118 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |