IL HB0792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code applies to all counties (currently, only applies to DuPage, Lake, and McHenry Counties).
Title
CNTY CD-LOCAL GOVT REDUCTION
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Consolidated Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-44010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |