IL HB0791 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not enact an ordinance prohibiting the use of autonomous vehicles on its roadways. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Defines "autonomous vehicle".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-ORDINANCE-AUTONOMOS VEH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-24HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-24HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-04-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-08SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback