IL HB0780 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that no candidate for President or Vice President of the United States shall appear on the official ballot if that candidate has not filed copies of all of his or her tax returns with the State Board of Elections at least 50 days prior to the general election. Defines "tax returns" to mean any tax returns filed with the federal Internal Revenue Service for the 5-year period prior to the general election.
Title
ELEC CD-TAX RELEASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-005-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 003-001-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-06 | House | To Ballot Access Subcommittee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |