IL HB0777 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the definition of "financial institution" in the Finance Division of the Code includes any savings bank, savings and loan association, or credit union (currently, savings and loan associations and federally chartered commercial bank or savings and loan association) and regional planning commissions or joint regional planning commissions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-002-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-1-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback