IL HB0777 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Finance Article of the Illinois Municipal Code. Revises the definition of "financial institution" to mean any bank, savings bank, savings and loan association, or credit union established under the laws of the United States, the State, or any other state; or any regional planning commissions or joint regional planning commissions union established under specified provisions (rather than any bank subject to the Illinois Banking Act, any savings and loan association subject to the Illinois Savings and Loan Act of 1985, any federally chartered commercial bank or savings and loan association organized and operated in this State pursuant to the laws of the United States, and any regional planning commissions or joint regional planning commissions union). Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-002-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-1-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=777&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0777.htm |