IL HB0776 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Park District Code. Provides that if a proposition to reduce a park district board from a 7-member board to a 5-member board was approved by referendum, the number of members elected at the election next following the referendum shall be reduced by 2. Further provides for procedures to ensure that the board members' terms are staggered after the reduction to a 5-member board depending on whether the members' terms are 4-year or 6-year terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARK DISTRICT-BOARD TERMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7012052-10aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback