IL HB0772 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electronic Products Recycling and Reuse Act. Provides that accreditation is not required for facilities that place cathode ray tube (CRT) glass in storage cells for future retrieval in accordance with specified provisions of the Act. Provides that any organization that accredits facilities pursuant to this Section is prohibited from penalizing or taking other negative actions against any recycler, refurbisher, or collector of CEDs and EEDs based on the recycler's, refurbisher's, or collector's use of a facility that places CRT glass in storage cells for future retrieval in accordance with specified provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTRONIC RECYCLE-ACCREDIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-02-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HouseArrived in House
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-014-000
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2018-02-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-02-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 014-000-000
2017-02-15HouseRe-assigned to Environment
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41515050Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback