IL HB0770 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to convey, in exchange for $1, certain real estate in McHenry County to the Fox Waterway Agency. Provides that the conveyance is subject to: (1) existing public utilities, existing public roads, and any and all reservations, easements, encumbrances, covenants, and restrictions of record; and (2) the express condition that any proceeds from the sale of the real property shall be utilized for the purchase and development of an alternate dredge material disposal site or sites. Authorizes the Director of Natural Resources to exchange described parcels of real estate in Lake County for another parcel of described real estate in Lake County. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-CONVEY REAL ESTATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback