IL HB0767 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in the case of residential property located in a gated residential community, nothing shall prohibit the chief county assessment officer, the board of review, or the Property Tax Appeal Board from considering comparable properties located outside of that gated residential community when determining the fair cash value of the property. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-GATED COMMUNITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |